Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | April 17 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |