|
10/15/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 831, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2479.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2838.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 871.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|