California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB50 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2017

Amended

Bill September 5, 2017
Bill July 12, 2017
Bill June 29, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017
Bill March 20, 2017
Bill February 22, 2017