|
10/10/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 649, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3032.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 546.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 488.) (March 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|