|
09/30/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 394, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 3160.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 952.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 743.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|