|
10/02/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 428, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2903.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2539.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Set for hearing September 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2854.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 990.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 974.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|