California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB513 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2017

Amended

Bill July 10, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill April 3, 2017