Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 1382.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1186.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 621.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|