Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/03/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | April 26 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 2. Page 854.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | March 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Set for hearing March 22. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |