Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1248.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1080.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 726.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|