|
09/29/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 6168.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 6199.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6112.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
June 20 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1273.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1186.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 783.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|