California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB542 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 15, 2017

Amended

Bill June 21, 2017
Bill April 20, 2017
Bill March 21, 2017