|
10/02/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 429, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 3010.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3025.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3005.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 3490.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 3223.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
August 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1246.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|