Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 953.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 746.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2017
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|