California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB549 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2017

Amended

Bill July 20, 2017
Bill June 27, 2017
Bill May 31, 2017
Bill March 29, 2017