Assembly | 09/01/2017 | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2017 | June 28 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2017 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2017 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1353.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1177.) (May 25). | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | April 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 370.) (March 8). | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Set for hearing March 8. | ||
Senate | 12/06/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. | ||
Senate | 12/05/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |