Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 830.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | March 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Set for hearing March 27. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |