Assembly | 06/01/2017 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1399.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Published May 26 at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1187.) (May 25). | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Set for hearing May 22. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 886.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |