Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | April 4 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |