Senate | 02/01/2018 | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Lara. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Set for hearing May 22. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1100.) (May 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Set for hearing May 17. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | May 10 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Set for hearing May 10. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |