Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | April 24 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | April 17 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | April 3 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |