Assembly
|
08/07/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 1349.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1187.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 853.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 783.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|