|
03/03/2018
|
Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2017
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2997.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3408.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
June 28 set forfirst hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1350.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1187.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 620.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|