|
10/09/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 626, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 2996.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3397.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 1068.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 853.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 559.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2017
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|