Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |