Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | April 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 363.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Set for hearing March 14. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2017 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2017 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 12/13/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 12. | ||
Senate | 12/12/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |