Assembly
|
06/18/2018
|
June 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and BUDGET. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2018
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1245.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 808.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|