California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB598 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2017

Amended

Bill September 11, 2017
Bill September 8, 2017
Bill September 5, 2017
Bill July 19, 2017
Bill July 5, 2017