Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | February 15 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2017 | Set for hearing February 15. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2017 | Referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2017 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 12/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 21. | ||
Senate | 12/21/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |