|
10/04/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 485, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2991.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 2942.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2877.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3272.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 905.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 599.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|