California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB612 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2017

Amended

Bill September 7, 2017
Bill August 21, 2017
Bill July 18, 2017
Bill July 3, 2017
Bill June 7, 2017
Bill May 9, 2017
Bill April 27, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017