|
09/01/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 219, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2233.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 2687.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1065.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Published May 4 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 751.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|