California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB615 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 15, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill September 5, 2017
Bill May 1, 2017