|
07/31/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 164, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/31/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2580.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1144.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Published May 9 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 945.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
April 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|