09/11/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 243, Statutes of 2017. | |||
09/11/2017 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 08/30/2017 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 8. Page 2762.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/17/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 12). | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2017 | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2017 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 798.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 620.) (April 5). | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |