Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
September 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2017
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 906.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 856.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25 in PUB. S. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|