Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
July 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2017
|
June 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1068.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2017
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|