Assembly | 09/11/2017 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2017 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2017 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2017 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2017 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 20). | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2017 | June 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2017 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 989.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 945.) (May 2). | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |