Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 806.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |