|
02/04/2018
|
Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2017
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1934.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2475.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1142.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 515.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|