Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | April 18 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 749.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |