California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB653 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2017

Amended

Bill April 19, 2017
Bill March 23, 2017