Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 856.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |