Assembly | 06/25/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | June 18 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2018 | June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2017 | June 26 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2017 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2017 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 1346.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 444.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Set for hearing March 22. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. | ||
Senate | 01/05/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |