|
02/26/2018
|
Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2017
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2232.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2582.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 768.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 726.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|