|
09/22/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 683, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 6137.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 6197.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d) . (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6076.) Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6958.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2017
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1224.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1020.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|