Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2017 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 598.) (April 4). | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. | ||
Senate | 01/05/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |