Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 850.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|