Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | April 25 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 856.) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |