Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | April 25 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 1. Page 853.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Set for hearing April 26 in ED. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and ED. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |